HI SB465 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB465
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to EDN, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to EDN, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Auditor to perform a program audit of the policies and procedures of the Board of Education and Department of Education to support schools in meeting the goals and statewide student success indicators outlined in the 2017-2020 strategic plan of the Board and Department. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to EDN, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 215) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 953) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Moriwaki. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from EDU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 369) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 3:10PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU/GVO, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB465 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to EDN, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 22
HB372 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
HB372 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).