HI SB436 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB436
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for establishing three specialty shelters to temporarily house and serve homeless individuals.
Title
Relating To Homeless Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HOU/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 286) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Tokuda. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-08-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 02-09-17 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HOU/HMS, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB436 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=436&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB436_.HTM |