HI SB420 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "board" to exclude neighborhood boards.
Title
Public Agency Meetings; Neighborhood Boards
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-17 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-15 1:05PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=420&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB420_.HTM |