HI SB367 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB367
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits sale of polystyrene foam food service containers and the sale or service of food using polystyrene containers statewide. Authorizes the Department of Health to adopt rules for implementation including for enforcement, exemptions, and consumer education. (SB367 HD1)
Title
Relating To Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Cachola, Kong, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1302) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-12-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 108) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Taniguchi. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 994) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from AEN/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 290) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB367 (Carry Over) 2019-03-20 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.