HI SB3384 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amount each juror or prospective juror is paid for each actual day of attendance at court.
Title
Relating To Jury Duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2425) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-24 9:30AM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |