HI SB3227 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates statewide electronic citation program under the Judiciary. Appropriates funds. Effective 1/1/2023. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Electronic Citations.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2368) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Gabbard. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2365 (Same As) 2022-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.