HI SB3218 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates November 28 of each year as La Kuokoa, Hawaiian Recognition Day, to celebrate the historical recognition of the independence of the Kingdom of Hawaii.
Title
Relating To Hawaiian Recognition Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from LCA/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2461) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to LCA/HWN, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |