HI SB3181 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to TCA, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to TCA, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises sections 286-239 and 286-240, HRS, to meet new federal regulations for commercial driver's licenses when the Drug and Alcohol Clearinghouse prohibits a driver from operating a commercial vehicle due to alcohol and drug violations.
Title
Relating To Commercial Driver's Licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to TCA, JDC. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2492 (Same As) 2024-07-02 - Act 136, 07/01/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1237).
Subjects
Commercial Driver's Licenses
Drug and Alcohol Clearinghouse
Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration
Drug and Alcohol Clearinghouse
Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3181&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB3181_.HTM |