HI SB313 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the intentional release of balloons inflated with a gas that is lighter than air.
Title
Relating To Litter Control.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to AEN, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=313&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB313_.HTM |