HI SB313 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-25 - Referred to AEN, JDC.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-25 - Referred to AEN, JDC.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the intentional release of balloons inflated with a gas that is lighter than air.
Title
Relating To Litter Control.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to AEN, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB313 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Referred to AEN, JDC.
HB1102 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - Act 141, 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243).
HB1102 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - Act 141, 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=313&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB313_.HTM |