HI SB3101 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Re-Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Re-Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the Executive Office on Early Learning from the Department of Education to the Department of Human Services. Renames the Office as the Learning to Grow Agency. Focuses the jurisdiction of the agency to children who are 3 to 4 years old or will be eligible for kindergarten within 2 years. Establishes the goal of providing all children who are 3 to 4 years old or will be eligible for kindergarten within 2 years with access to learning through an early learning program by the year 2030. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Access To Learning.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2543 (Same As) 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3101&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB3101_.HTM |