HI HB2543 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires parents or guardians of public school and charter school kindergarten students to disclose information on the student's prior child care program or prekindergarten attendance, if any, for the purpose of determining areas having the highest need for prekindergarten and child care programs. Requires assessment of public school and charter school kindergarten students. Removes public charter school prekindergarten programs from the administrative authority of the Executive Office on Early Learning. Establishes that the State Public Charter School Commission has administrative authority over all state-funded early learning programs in public charter schools. Establishes the preschool open doors special fund. Expands Preschool Open Doors Program eligibility from 4-year-old children to all children who are 3 to 4 years old who are in the 2 years prior to kindergarten entry. Requires annual reporting regarding the revenues and expenditures of the early learning special fund. Establishes a program for Department of Human Services to award grants for preschools. Authorizes positions for the Preschool Open Doors Program. Appropriates funds for Department of Human Services to expand its information technology system for the purpose of managing information on prekindergarten attendance and child care need and to contract for and operate preschool and child care programs. Establishes the goal of providing all children who are 3 to 4 years old who are in the 2 years prior to kindergarten entry with enrollment in a preschool program by the year 2030. Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii for building classrooms for Hawaiian language immersion pre-kindergarten programs. Appropriates funds for building early learning services classrooms on public library property. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Access To Learning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 425). |
2020-07-10 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Takumi voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2020-07-10 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Received notice of House intent to agree to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 421). |
2020-07-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 604) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3767) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-06-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 06-30-20 10:15AM in conference room Auditorium. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3690) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU will hold a public decision making on 06-24-20 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-18-20 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-20 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 339). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto, Perruso, Takumi voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from LHE/FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 961-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, Tarnas. |
2020-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2020-02-18 | House | The committee(s) on LHE/FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-20. |
2020-02-14 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE/FIN on Tuesday, 02-18-20 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LHE/FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3101 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - Re-Referred to EDU, WAM.