HI SB3090 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an unspecified appropriation to implement a statewide hunter education program and develop shooting ranges. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Hunter Education Program; Shooting Range Development; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2). |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1039-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, Nishimoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Say, Fale. |
2014-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-17-14 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 369) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2679) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-14 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-14 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2170) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Dela Cruz, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-14 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |