HI SB3015 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds for Hawaiian Electric Company, Inc. and its subsidiaries Maui Electric Company, Limited, and Hawaii Electric Light Company, Inc., for multiproject capital improvement programs. Takes effect 7/1/2040. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Special Purpose Revenue Bonds For Electric Public Utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2595) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-24 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1690 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to CPC/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1