HI HB1690 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to CPC/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to CPC/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds for Hawaiian Electric Company, Inc. and its subsidiaries Maui Electric Company and Hawaii Electric Light Company for multi-project capital improvement programs.
Title
Relating To Special Purpose Revenue Bonds For Electric Public Utilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to CPC/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3015 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1690&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1690_.HTM |