HI SB3000 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "emergency worker" in the Penal Code to include communications dispatchers.
Title
Relating To Emergency Workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-20 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2623) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2474 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.