HI SB2999 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state agencies to participate in a carbon offset program to offset carbon emissions caused by their employees' air travel. Requires DLNR to establish and administer a carbon offset program.
Title
State Employees; Air Travel; DLNR; Carbon Offset Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee on TRE deferred the measure. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-16 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EET/TRE, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2558 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Referred to EET/GVO, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2999&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2999_.HTM |