HI HB2558 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to EET/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to EET/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state agencies to participate in a carbon offset program to offset carbon emissions caused by their employees' air travel. Requires DLNR to establish and administer a carbon offset program. (HB2558 HD1)
Title
State Employees; Air Travel; DLNR; Carbon Offset Program
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to EET/GVO, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 328). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Ohno, Onishi, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Say voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 955-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 513-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-11 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-11-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2999 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.