HI SB2955 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes probation officers to carry and use electric guns under certain conditions. (SD1)
Title
Probation Officers; Electric Guns
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2274) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ryan, Slom. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-12 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to PGM, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |