HI SB2944 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of important agricultural lands and lands with class A or B productivity ratings for waste disposal. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Agricultural Lands.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-15-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 80) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Lee). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2840) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2625) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-22 1:20PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN, JDC. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1712 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).