HI HB1712 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits siting of waste disposal facilities on important agricultural lands and agricultural lands with class A and B productivity ratings. Effective 7/30/2075. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Agricultural Lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Kitagawa, Branco Co-Chairs; Kong, McDermott. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 783) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3956) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee on JDC/WAM has rescheduled its decision making to 04-05-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3275) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-14-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to AEN, JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 148). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 899-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 339-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-10 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-10-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, McDermott, McKelvey excused (4). |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 43-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-01 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, McDermott. |
2022-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-01-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2944 (Same As) 2022-03-15 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.