HI SB2920 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-13 - Act 013, 08/12/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1117).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-13 - Act 013, 08/12/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1117).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Conforms Hawaii income and estate and generation-skipping transfer tax laws to the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended as of 3/27/2020, with special provisions to conform to parts of federal Public Law 116-136, the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act, which took effect on 3/27/2020. Conforms Hawaii estate and generation-skipping transfer tax laws to the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended as of 12/31/2019. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Conformity To The Internal Revenue Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Senate | Act 013, 08/12/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1117). |
2020-08-13 | House | Act 013, on 08/12/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1117). |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 632). |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 07-10-20. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 07-10-20. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Deferred One Day 07-08-20. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 383). |
2020-07-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-06-30 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Say excused (3). |
2020-06-30 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1246-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-06-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi. |
2020-06-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 06-29-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 31 |
2020-02-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-02-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 16) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-10-20. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2411) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2364 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Conformity to the Internal Revenue Code for 2019
Estate and Generation-skipping Transfer Tax
Income Tax
Estate and Generation-skipping Transfer Tax
Income Tax