HI SB2920 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the circumstance for the Director of Public Safety to release pre-trial and sentenced misdemeanants at community correctional centers.
Title
Release of Certain Misdemeanants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2391 (Same As) 2016-07-07 - Act 217, 07/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2920&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2920_.HTM |