HI SB2896 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-03 - (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Chun Oakland, Slom.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-03 - (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Chun Oakland, Slom.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the class C felony offense of knowing exposure to HIV.
Title
HIV; Human Immunodeficiency Virus; Penal Code; Offenses Against the Person
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Chun Oakland, Slom. | |
2012-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-12 3:15PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to HTH, JDL. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2896 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2896_.HTM |