HI SB2890 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Act 043, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Act 043, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction to reflect that the term "estate taxes" means taxes imposed under either chapter 236D or chapter 236E, HRS, as applicable based on the date of death. Applies the technical correction retroactively to 01/26/2012. (SD1)
Title
Taxes; Application of the Internal Revenue Code
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Act 043, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143). |
2014-04-25 | House | Act 043, on 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Woodson excused (3). |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1515-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Woodson. |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-27-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2014-02-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 31) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-18-14. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2457) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Tokuda. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-05-14 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2340 (Same As) 2014-01-27 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6