HI SB2868 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Lowers to one-thirty-second Hawaiian the blood quantum required by a homestead lessee's husband, wife, children, grandchildren, brothers, or sisters in order to succeed to the lessee's lease. Requires Congressional approval. (SD1)
Title
Hawaiian Homes Commission Act; Hawaiian Home Lands; Lease Successors; Blood Quantum
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HWN/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2194) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, English, Inouye, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 02-10-16 1:16PM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-09-16 9:01AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-16 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HWN/JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2339 (Same As) 2016-02-03 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.