HI HB2339 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Lowers the required blood quantum to one-thirty second Hawaiian for the lessee's relatives currently eligible to succeed to a lease with one-thirty second Hawaiian including a lessee's husband, wife, children, grandchildren, brothers or sisters.
Title
Hawaiian Home Lands; lease successors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-03-16 10:15AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2868 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2339&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2339_.HTM |