HI SB2849 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - (H) The committee(s) on WLO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the definition of "sailing school vessel" to mean, among other things, a vessel that is in compliance with part 169 of title 46 Code of Federal Regulations. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sailing School Vessels

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 (H) The committee(s) on WLO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2012-03-16 (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-19-12 9:00AM in conference room 325.
2012-03-16 (H) The committee(s) on WLO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-12.
2012-03-13 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 03-16-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
2012-03-08 (H) Referred to WLO, JUD, referral sheet 41
2012-03-08 (H) Pass First Reading
2012-03-06 (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 337) in amended form (SD 1).
2012-03-06 (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2012-03-01 (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12.
2012-03-01 (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2012-03-01 (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2492) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2012-02-23 (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2012-02-17 (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-12 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2012-01-25 (S) Referred to JDL.
2012-01-25 (S) Passed First Reading.
2012-01-25 (S) Introduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2587 (Same As) 2012-04-18 - (S) Act 027, 4/17/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127).

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback