HI HB2587 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - (S) Act 027, 4/17/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - (S) Act 027, 4/17/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "sailing school vessel" to mean, among other things, a vessel that is in compliance with the title 46 Code of Federal Regulations part 169. (HB2587 HD1)
Title
Sailing School Vessels
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | (S) Act 027, 4/17/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127). | |
2012-04-18 | (H) Act 027, on 4/17/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127). | |
2012-04-04 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 471). | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) One Day Notice 04-04-12. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3146) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-12 10:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 253). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 696-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-21-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-02 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Okamura excused (1). | |
2012-02-02 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 42-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-01-30 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Monday, 01-30-12 9:15AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to WLO, JUD, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2849 (Same As) 2012-03-19 - (H) The committee(s) on WLO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.