HI SB2814 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the circumstances for the Director of Public Safety or a designee of the director to release pretrial and sentenced misdemeanants at community correctional centers.
Title
Relating To The Release Of Misdemeanants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-18 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2387 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2814&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2814_.HTM |