HI SB2769 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 258, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1361).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 258, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1361).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Insurance Commissioner to publish a list of homeowners insurers and homeowners insurance annual premiums, and motor vehicle insurers and motor vehicle insurance annual premiums on the Insurance Division's official website. Clarifies the Insurance Commissioner's ability to intervene to adjust insurance rates. Provides for written notice of disapproval and hearing requirements. Includes advisory organizations in the rate filings and regulation process under Article 14, Chapter 431, Hawaii Revised Statutes. (CD1)
Title
Insurance; Publication of Rates; Rate Filings; Rate Intervention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 258, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1361). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 258, on 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1361). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-02 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ching excused (1). | |
2012-04-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 12-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 12-12). | |
2012-04-25 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Herkes, Kawakami; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2012-04-25 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 755). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Espero, Co-Chair(s); Galuteria, Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Cabanilla, Herkes, Kawakami Co-Chairs; Pine. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 487). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1662-12) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-02-12 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1297-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Coffman, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Herkes, Carroll, Ching. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-19-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1037-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Ito, Carroll, Chang, Coffman, Har, Kawakami, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Herkes, Pine, Thielen. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 03-14-12 10:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 296) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2742) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2238) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-09-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to CPN, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2507 (Same As) 2012-02-10 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2).