HI SB276 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Hawaii kupuna trust fund, which comprises public and private funding for meeting the outstanding and future needs of the elder and vulnerable adult population. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Hawaii Kupuna Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-19-15 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 99) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 752) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 123) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-15 1:20PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HSH, WAM. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |