HI SB2755 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - (S) Recommitted to JGO.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - (S) Recommitted to JGO.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Promotes safer roadways and fewer distractions while driving by prohibiting the use of mobile electronic devices while operating a motor vehicle, with certain exceptions. (SD2)
Title
Highway; Safety; Distracted Driving; Motor Vehicle
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | (S) Recommitted to JGO. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2563) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Takamine, Bunda. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO will hold a public decision making on 02-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2048) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Espero, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-10 2:05pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to TIA, JGO. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2602 (Same As) 2010-02-09 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).