HI HB2602 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of mobile electronic devices. (HB2602 HD1)
Title
Highway; Safety; Distracted Driving; Motor Vehicle
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 200-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2010-02-03 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Awana, Aquino, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Rhoads, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki, Pine. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-03-10 9:00am in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2755 (Same As) 2010-03-02 - (S) Recommitted to JGO.