HI SB2744 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend Article 1 of the Hawaii Constitution by establishing the right of each person to own and have an exclusive property right in the data they generate on the Internet.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To The State Constitution Establishing The Right To Own One's Own Data.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2422) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Gabbard. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2050 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3