HI SB2678 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - (S) Act 235, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1338).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - (S) Act 235, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1338).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DLNR to establish a Honouliuli park site project advisory group to develop recommendations to leverage county, state, federal, and private funding for an educational resource center at the Honouliuli site; requires report to 2013 legislature; appropriates $100,000 for the activities of the advisory group; requires that no funds shall be expended unless matched on a dollar-for-dollar basis by federal, private, or other external funds. (CD1)
Title
Honouliuli Camp Site; Advisory Group; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-06 | (S) Act 235, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1338). | |
2012-07-06 | (H) Act 235, on 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1338). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-04 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 728). | |
2012-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 839). | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 177-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 177-12). | |
2012-04-30 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Dela Cruz, Espero, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. | |
2012-04-30 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Cabanilla, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-30 | (H) Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 829). | |
2012-04-30 | (S) Senator(s) Ige added as Co-Chair(s). | |
2012-04-29 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-30-12 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 5:20PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 4:00PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-12 4:00PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-12 3:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 755). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Fukunaga, Chair; Dela Cruz, Espero, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Chang, Har Co-Chairs; Cabanilla, Riviere. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 469). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1655-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-03-31 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-02-12 5:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-29-12 1:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1303-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Coffman, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committee(s) on WLO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-22-12 at 9:30 AM. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-21-12 11:15AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The committee(s) on WLO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-12. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Monday, 03-19-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 262) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2634) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from EDT/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2392) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Fukunaga, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/WLH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-14-12 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Re-Referred to EDT/WLH, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to WLH, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |