HI SB264 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB264
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - The committee(s) on AEN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - The committee(s) on AEN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates unspecified funds for climate change. Effective 7/1/2050.
Title
Relating To Climate Change.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB264 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Referred to AEN, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=264&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB264_.HTM |