HI SB2612 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows a court to enjoin a defendant convicted of committing certain assault or terroristic threatening offenses against a sports official from attending any sports event of the type at which the sports official was engaged in the lawful discharge of the sports official's duties. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Sports Officials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-13SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2020-07-10HouseReceived notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 632).
2020-07-10SenatePassed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2020-07-08SenateOne Day Notice 07-10-20.
2020-07-08SenateSenate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 07-10-20.
2020-07-06SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 403).
2020-07-06HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Nakamura excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-07-01HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2020-07-01HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1253-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2020-03-12HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2020-03-11HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-12-20 2:30PM in conference room 325.
2020-03-11HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Thursday, 03-12-20 at 2:30 PM.
2020-03-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to JUD , referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 293) in amended form (SD 1).
2020-03-03SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2020-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3098) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2020-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim.
2020-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-20 10:01AM in conference room 016.
2020-01-23SenateReferred to JDC.
2020-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback