HI SB2609 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - The committee on LBT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - The committee on LBT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases from $2,000 to $2,240, the minimum amount of guaranteed compensation required for an individual employed by and an employer who is exempt from the State's Wage and Hour Law.
Title
Relating To Minimum Wage.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee on LBT deferred the measure. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-24 3:10PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LBT, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2609&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2609_.HTM |