HI SB2607 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the Research Corporation of the University of Hawaii's exemption from the procurement code for advertising for bids and purchases to be made in Hawaii to research, training, and development related contracts and projects that obtain federal or state grants and requires that all federal and state grants, contracts, and projects adhere to all federal procurement laws and regulations. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Research Corporation Of The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from GVO/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2514) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, S. Chang, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO/HRE, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |