HI SB2586 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to CPN/PSM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to CPN/PSM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires planned community associations to either develop and adopt program rules for a neighborhood security watch program within the association's planned community or allocate a portion of the association's regular assessments to fund a neighborhood security watch program offered by a qualified third-party organization, no later than one year after the effective date of this Act.
Title
Relating To Neighborhood Security Watch Programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN/PSM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2573 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to CPC/JHA, referral sheet 3
HB2727 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3
HB2727 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2586&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2586_.HTM |