MI SB0747 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-11 - Postponed For The Day
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-11 - Postponed For The Day
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations: omnibus; appropriations for multiple departments and branches for fiscal year 2024-2025 and supplemental appropriations for fiscal year 2023-2024; provide for. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations: omnibus; appropriations for multiple departments and branches for fiscal year 2024-2025 and supplemental appropriations for fiscal year 2023-2024; provide for. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - House - House Third Reading: Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 294 (Y: 56 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 330 (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 209 (Y: 56 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 241 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 330 (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 209 (Y: 56 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 241 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-11 | Senate | Postponed For The Day |
2024-07-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0121'24 With Immediate Effect |
2024-07-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/24/2024 04:22 Pm |
2024-07-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor With Line Item(s) Vetoed 07/24/2024 11:27 Am |
2024-07-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 07/15/2024 02:52 Pm |
2024-07-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled Out Of Session |
2024-06-27 | House | Returned To Senate |
2024-06-27 | House | Given Immediate Effect |
2024-06-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 294 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-27 | House | Rule Suspended |
2024-06-27 | House | Returned To Senate |
2024-06-27 | House | Conference Report Received |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 330 Yeas 21 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Conference Report Received In Senate |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Referred To Conference Committee |
2024-06-25 | House | House Conferees Named 06/25/2024: Reps. Angela Witwer Amos O'neal Sarah Lightner |
2024-06-20 | House | Senate Conferees Named 06/20/2024: Sens. Sarah Anthony Sean Mccann Jon Bumstead |
2024-06-25 | House | Re-received From Senate With Notice Of Nonconcurrence In House Substitute (h-1) |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Senate Named Conferees 06/20/2024: Sens. Sarah Anthony, Sean Mccann, Jon C. Bumstead |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 271 Yeas 0 Nays 37 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-20 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Nonconcurred In |
2024-06-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2024-06-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 209 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2024-06-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-06-20 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2024-06-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-20 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2024-06-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-06-20 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2024-06-20 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2024-06-18 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2024-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2024-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-06-12 | House | Received On 06/12/2024 |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 241 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Sarah Anthony |
2024-06-27 | House | Conference Report Received |