HI SB257 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to WAL, JHA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the board of land and natural resources to establish a public lands lease extension pilot project to extend certain leases of public lands for commercial, industrial, resort, mixed-use, or government use upon approval of a proposed development agreement to make substantial improvements to the existing improvements. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Lease Extensions On Public Land.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseReferred to WAL, JHA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 183) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-03-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Nishihara, Rhoads, Riviere. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 947) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-03-04SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-03-02SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 1:35PM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-24SenateRe-Referred to WTL, WAM.
2021-02-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-11SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 157) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229.
2021-01-27SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has rescheduled its public hearing to 01-29-21 1:00PM in conference room 229.
2021-01-26SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to WTL, JDC.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB499 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 683) in amended form (SD 2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback