HI HB499 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Sayama, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marten, Wildberger; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Eli, Perruso, Tam; and Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Board of Land and Natural Resources to extend certain leases of public lands for commercial, industrial, resort, mixed-use, or government use upon approval of a proposed development agreement to make substantial improvements to the existing improvements. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Lease Extensions On Public Land.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Sayama, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marten, Wildberger; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Eli, Perruso, Tam; and Excused: none.
2021-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-18HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Ganaden, LoPresti, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Kapela, Perruso, Tam voting no (4) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
2021-02-18HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 374) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2021-02-11HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-05HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Kapela, Perruso, Tam voting no (4) and Representative(s) Matayoshi excused (1).
2021-02-05HouseReported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 26) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2021-02-02HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, McDermott.
2021-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB257 (Same As) 2021-03-02 - The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 1:35PM; CR 211 & Videoconference.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback