HI SB2567 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes court to condition probation on requirement that a convicted defendant stay nightly in a homeless facility. Clarifies that probation may be imposed for conviction of a county crime. Appropriates moneys from the general fund for implementation. Effective 01/01/17.
Title
Probation; Overnight Stay in Homeless Facility ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2567&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2567_.HTM |