HI SB2564 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the state rent supplement program from the Hawaii public housing authority to the department of human services on 07/01/17. Establishes a short-term limited exemption from chapter 91, Hawaii Revised Statutes, for the adoption of initial rules by the department for the program. Makes an appropriation and authorizes 2.00 positions to prepare for the transfer.
Title
State Rent Supplement Program; Transfer ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-16 1:20PM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HOU/HMS, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2564&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2564_.HTM |