HI SB2558 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes a penalty for knowingly selling invasive plants or plants containing invasive species.
Title
Relating To Invasive Species.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 1:31PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN, JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2537 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2558&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2558_.HTM |