HI SB2555 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the public utilities commission to adopt rules that will enable government entities to purchase electricity in bulk electrical loads; authorizes government entities that purchase electricity in bulk electrical loads to contract with renewable energy producers.
Title
Electricity; Aggregation; Government Entities
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Fred Hemmings [R] |
Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-09-10 2:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-10 3:00pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to ENE, CPN. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2555&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2555_.HTM |