HI SB255 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB255
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of land and natural resources to establish rules and fees for the issuance of a commercial marine vessel license. Provides that a single valid commercial marine vessel license satisfies the licensure requirement for all persons aboard the licensed vessel. Requires any person who provides fishing charter services to obtain a commercial marine license. Allows marine charter fishing vessels to obtain commercial marine vessel licenses. Requires the department of land and natural resources to submit a report to the legislature regarding the status of its administrative rules establishing a new commercial marine vessel license category. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Commercial Marine Licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 182) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 653) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 254) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has rescheduled its public hearing to 01-29-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to WTL, CPN. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB255 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22