HI SB254 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB254
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to TEC/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to TEC/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires persons who manufacture, sell, offer for sale, lease, or distribute a product that makes content accessible on the Internet to include digital blocking capability that renders human trafficking hubs, child pornography, revenge pornography, and pornographic material inaccessible. Requires these persons to establish and maintain a reporting system for content that is improperly blocked and applicable content that is not blocked. Allows consumers to disable the blocking capability if the consumer fulfils requirements, including paying a fee for deposit in the human trafficking victim services fund. Establishes the misdemeanor offense of intentionally failing to include digital blocking capability. Establishes the human trafficking and child exploitation prevention special fund to provide grants for various purposes. Effective 7/1/2020.
Title
Relating To Digital Content Blockers.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to TEC/JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB254 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TEC/JDC, WAM.
HB567 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Kong, Nishimoto, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Gates, Takayama; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
HB567 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Kong, Nishimoto, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Gates, Takayama; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=254&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB254_.HTM |